IL HB3752 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that each year the Director of Natural Resources may designate that Veterans Day, as federally designated, is a day when sport fishermen may fish waters wholly or in part within the jurisdiction of the State, including the part of Lake Michigan under the jurisdiction of the State, and not be required to obtain a license or stamp. Provides that the amendatory provisions shall not apply to commercial fishing.
Title
VETERANS DAY-FISHING LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |