IL HB3747 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that appointments to the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, other than the ex officio members, shall be made by the Executive Director of the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board from a list of nominees selected by a majority of votes of the President of the Illinois Sheriffs' Association, the President of the Illinois Association of Chiefs of Police, the President of the Illinois Fraternal Order of Police Labor Council and the President of the Fraternal Order of Police, Chicago Lodge 7 (rather than the Governor).
Title
POLICE TRAINING-ILETSB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3747&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3747.htm |