IL HB3747 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Agricultural Fair Act. Provides that in counties where a Fair and Exposition Authority participated in 1999, the Fair and Exposition Authority shall transfer all remaining funds to the county fair in such county within 30 days of the effective date of this amendatory Act. Further provides that the terms of the Authority's members shall terminate upon the transfer of all remaining funds and the Authority shall cease to exist. Deletes provisions regarding the Authority's participation in the appropriation from the Fair and Exposition Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
AG FAIR ACT-EXPOSITION AUTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0183 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 120 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 120 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |