IL HB3746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for individuals, trusts, and estates for certain qualified student loan payments made during the taxable year. Provides that the deduction is excluded from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-EDUCATION LOANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback