IL HB3745 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires public and charter schools to post, in English and Spanish, information regarding local community after-school programs at each school campus in at least one high-traffic, highly and clearly visible, public area that is readily accessible to and widely used by students.
Title
SCH CD-COMMUNITY PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2017-09-22 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2017-07-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-28 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 066-044-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-013-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 010-003-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-045-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-005-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |