IL HB3738 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, as amended by House Amendments Nos. 1, 3, and 4. Specifies that "confinement" does not include medical isolation or quarantine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

YOUTH SOLITARY CONFINEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2022-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2022-03-07SenateArrive in Senate
2022-03-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-040-000
2022-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2022-03-04HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2022-03-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-03-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-04HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails 060-037-000
2022-03-03HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2022-03-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-039-000
2022-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2022-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2022-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2022-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2022-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-008-000
2022-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-008-000
2022-03-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2022-03-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2022-03-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-03-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2022-02-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
2022-02-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
2022-02-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2022-02-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-01-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2022-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-01-25HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback