IL HB3737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Government Cybersecurity Review Act. Creates the Division of Cybersecurity Inspection within the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides that the Division shall review all websites operated by State agencies to determine whether cybersecurity flaws and data breach risks exist. Provides that, if the Division finds that a cybersecurity flaw or data breach risk exists, the Division may issue an order to the State agency to cease operation of the website until the cybersecurity flaw or data breach risk has been resolved.
Title
GOVT CYBERSECURITY REVIEW ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |