IL HB3735 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that it is an aggravating factor in sentencing that the defendant committed a crime of violence or criminal damage to property in a woman's health clinic or on the real property comprising the clinic or who intimidates persons attending the clinic or physicians or nurses at the clinic performing services at the clinic. Defines "woman's health clinic" and "crime of violence".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-AGGRAVATING FACTORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-28HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2017-03-21HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-03-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-21HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-03-21HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-03-20HousePension Note Filed
2017-03-20HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-03-20HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-5-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback