IL HB3734 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be delivered, sold, or purchased or cause to be possessed by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits delivery, sale, purchase or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices. Provides exemptions and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD ASSAULT WEAPONS BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-08-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-07-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1.10New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback