IL HB3733 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in addition to any other penalties, the court shall impose a fee of $300 for gunrunning and firearms trafficking. Provides that the fee shall be deposited into the Traffic and Criminal Conviction Surcharge Fund to be used for grants by the Department of State Police to units of local government to purchase bulletproof vests for local police departments and to hire peace officers.
Title
GUNRUNNING&FIREARMS TRAF-FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-15 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-3A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |