IL HB3731 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that a person who willfully or maliciously tortures, mutilates, injures, disables, poisons, or kills any animal used by a law enforcement department or agency in the performance of the functions or duties of the department or agency or when placed in confinement off duty, any service animal, any search and rescue dog, any law enforcement, service, or search and rescue animal in training, or any accelerant detection canine used by a fire officer for arson investigations in the performance of his or her functions or while off duty is guilty of a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony) if the animal is killed or totally disabled and a person is guilty of a Class 2 felony (rather than a Class 3 felony) if the animal is killed or totally disabled. Provides that a person who kills or severely injures any animal used by a law enforcement department or agency in the performance of the functions or duties of the department or agency of when placed off duty, any service animal, any search and rescue dog, any law enforcement, service, or search and rescue animal in training, or any accelerant detection canine used by a fire officer for arson investigations in the performance of his or her functions or while off duty, while he or she is in the commission of a felony, is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Provides that if an offender is found guilty of this offense, the offender shall be responsible for any veterinarian bills for an animal that was injured, and training costs for another animal, if the animal injured or killed is no longer able to be in service.
Title
ANIMALS-POLICE AND SERVICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 4.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |