IL HB3729 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who is an elected municipal official shall not be considered a participating employee, unless (1) the person has elected to become a participating employee; (2) the participating municipality has filed a resolution certifying that a person in that position is expected to work more than 600 hours (or 1,000 hours if the participating municipality has adopted a specified resolution); and (3) the person has submitted logs evidencing that he or she has met the hourly standard. Requires the resolution to be adopted and filed with the Fund no more than 90 days after the general election in which any municipal official was elected. Provides that with respect to a participant who holds elected municipal office on the effective date, the resolution requirement does not affect participation by that elected municipal official with respect to that term of office until 90 days after the effective date. Contains provisions specifying the manner of documenting and submitting the time spent on official government business. Provides that an elected municipal official who fails to submit time sheets or fails to conduct official government business for either 600 or 1,000 hours (whichever is applicable) with respect to that position shall not be permitted to continue participation in the Fund as an elected municipal official. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-IMRF-MUNICIPAL OFFICIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-06-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-06-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-06-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-06-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-137.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3729&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3729.htm |