IL HB3726 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that a member of the General Assembly, his or her spouse, and any immediate family member living with that member of the General Assembly shall not, for compensation, lobby any official of the executive or legislative branch of State government or any official of any unit of local government. Provides that a person who violates these provisions is guilty of official misconduct, a Class 3 felony. Defines terms. Repeals current provisions banning members of the General Assembly from lobbying, a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
GA MEMBER-LOBBYING BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3726&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3726.htm |