IL HB3720 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the State Employees’ Retirement System, Judges Retirement System and General Assembly Retirement System for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019, as follows: General Funds $1,459,868,950.
Title
$FY20 SERS OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3720&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB3720.pdf |