IL HB3720 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-039-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that surplus tax revenues may be used to pay for costs of special education, social services, and other costs of a public school district. Provides that for municipalities with a population of over 1,000,000, redevelopment project costs include public school district qualified workers, costs of providing special educational facilities and services, school psychological services, and school social work services, and any surplus balance in the special tax allocation fund at the end of the fiscal year shall be used for these workers, facilities, and services. Removes provisions allowing anticipated redevelopment project costs to be deemed surplus funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-SURPLUS FUNDS-SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-039-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-06HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2017-03-23HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-23HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-7Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-8Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-8aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback