IL HB3718 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Revises and consolidates provisions regarding obtaining and issuing orders of protection, protective orders, and no contact orders. Repeals various provisions in the domestic violence order of protection provisions as part of the revision and consolidation. Creates a criminal offense for violation of a civil no contact order and for violation of a stalking no contact order. Makes a first violation a Class A misdemeanor and a second or subsequent a Class 4 felony. Makes conforming changes.
Title
CRIM PRO-PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0199 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |