IL HB3718 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that local law enforcement, the State Board of Education, the Department of Human Services, and the Public Defender may designate representatives to serve on county juvenile justice councils. Provides that the Justice Advisory Council Director or his or her designee, or if the county has no Justice Advisory Council Director, the State's Attorney, shall serve as interim chairperson. Provides that the chairperson shall appoint additional members of the council which are representatives of local law enforcement, juvenile justice agencies, faith organizations, schools, businesses, and community organizations. Provides for the creation of Local Advisory Committees, and that 20% of the membership of these Committees must be local-justice involved youths aged 16-21. Provides that the duties and responsibilities of the Juvenile Justice Council includes facilitating community based collaboration and perspective on oversight, research, and evaluation of activities, programs, and policies directed towards and impacting the lives of juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUVENILE COURT/CORRECTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 79 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0258
2015-08-04HouseEffective Date January 1, 2016
2015-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2015-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2015-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2015-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2015-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2015-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2015-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2015-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2015-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2015-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 079-032-000
2015-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 016-000-000
2015-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
2015-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2015-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2015-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2015-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2015-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-05-20HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2015-05-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2015-05-20HouseArrived in House
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-006-000
2015-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2015-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015
2015-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2015-05-12SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2015-05-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
2015-05-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-001-000
2015-05-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2015-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2015-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-04-29SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2015-04-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2015-04-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-16SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2015-04-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2015-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2015-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2015-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 015-000-000
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054056-12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback