IL HB3718 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Increases the minimum wage to $9.25 per hour on October 1, 2014, $10 per hour on July 1, 2015, and $10.65 per hour on July 1, 2016. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MIN WAGE-INCREASE 2014-2016

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-11-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2014-11-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2014-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2014-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2014-09-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy
2014-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2014-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2014-08-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2014-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2014-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2014-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2014-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2014-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr.
2014-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith
2014-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2014-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy
2014-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2014-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2014-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2013-10-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2013-10-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2013-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2013-10-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2013-10-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2013-10-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2013-10-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-10-22HouseFirst Reading
2013-10-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-10-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback