IL HB3718 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. In a Section concerning AM broadcast towers and facilities and specified facilities of telecommunication carriers, authorizes any county to impose a minimum lot line set back distance of 300 feet for a telecommunication carrier facility or an AM broadcast facility from a residentially zoned lot.
Title
CNTY CD-ZONING-TOWERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0696 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-30 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Telecommunications and Information Technology | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel |