IL HB3715 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires that the Agency define "microplastics" and examine the role of microplastics in public drinking water. Requires the Agency to publicly disclose the results of its testing and reporting. Provides that the Agency, if appropriate, is to consider issuing a notification level to aid consumer interpretations. Requires the Agency to accredit qualified laboratories in Illinois to analyze microplastics.
Title
EPA-MICROPLASTICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3715&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3715.htm |