IL HB3712 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide educational and visitation opportunities to committed persons within its institutions through temporary access to content-controlled tablets that may be provided as a privilege to committed persons to induce or reward compliance. Defines "content-controlled tablet" as any device that can only access visitation applications or content relating to educational or personal development.
Title
CD CORR-CONTENT CONT TABLET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0198 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-006-000 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 060-049-001 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-30 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-03-30 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-29 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |