IL HB3710 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Replaces provisions concerning designation of distressed facilities with language providing that: by January 1, 2021, and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Public Health shall generate and publish a list of no more than 10 distressed facilities at any one time; the facilities shall be selected using criteria established by rule for both certified and noncertified facilities and that certified facilities shall be selected from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services' Special Focus Facility Candidate List; the Department shall notify each facility within 30 days of that facility's distressed designation and that a facility has 30 days after that notification to register an appeal; the Department may, using criteria established by rule, place a monitor in a facility designated as a distressed facility; the Department shall notify a facility at least 30 days prior to placement of a monitor in the facility and that, if any deficiencies or violations have not been corrected within 30 days of being publicly designated as a distressed facility, the facility shall develop and assist in the implementation of a plan of improvement; and once a facility has proven to be without health deficiencies for 12 months it shall be removed from the distressed facilities list. Makes other changes.
Title
IDPH-DISTRESSED FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-304.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3710&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3710.htm |