IL HB3708 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Family and Medical Leave Act. Provides that employees are entitled to 12 weeks of leave during a calendar year. Provides that leave may be used for absence from work due to (1) personal illness, injury, or medical appointment of the employee, (2) illness, injury, or medical appointment of a member of the employee's family, or (3) for the birth of a child or the adoption of a child under one year of age. Requires the employer to pay the cost of health insurance applicable to the employee during the period of leave. Requires that the employee be returned to his or her position or an equivalent position upon completion of the family medical leave period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMILY MEDICAL LEAVE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback