IL HB3706 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Includes public therapeutics programs in the definition of "special educational facilities and services". In a provision requiring a school district to pay the cost of tuition for special education and related services if a child attends a non-public school or special education facility, a public out-of-state school, or a special education facility owned and operated by a county government unit, provides that the special education and related services includes public therapeutics programs.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-THERAPEUTICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-1.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |