IL HB3703 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Out-of-State Person Subject to Involuntary Admission on an Inpatient Basis Mental Health Treatment Act. Provides that on or before January 1, 2018, there is created a 2-year mental health pilot project for which a mental health facility located in Rock Island County, Illinois may accept the admission of an Iowa resident from the Eastern Iowa Mental Health Region who is a person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis under an order issued by an Iowa court for treatment at a mental health facility in this State for which the Iowa court shall have jurisdiction over the recipient while committed to a mental health facility in this State. Provides that the pilot project shall also provide that a resident of Rock Island County, Illinois who is a person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis under an order issued by a court of this State for treatment at a mental health facility in this State may receive inpatient treatment in an Iowa mental health facility. Provides that the Iowa or Illinois mental health facility shall provide mental health services to the recipient for the duration of the court order and shall return the recipient to his or her state of legal residence upon discharge. If a recipient has to enter a State-operated facility, the recipient must be returned to his or her state of legal residence. Defines "Eastern Iowa Mental Health Region", "person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis", "mental health facility", "Pilot project area", "receiving agency", "receiving state", and "sending state". Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2020. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IOWA MH-INVOLUNTARY ADMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 020-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback