IL HB3701 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services is not required to verify positions within the Department of Juvenile Justice requiring licensure by the State Board of Education under the School Code. Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Makes a technical change concerning the sealing of records. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice and who resides in the State is charged under the criminal laws of this State, the criminal laws of any other state, or the federal jurisdiction with similar penalties with an offense that could result in a sentence of imprisonment within the Department of Corrections, another state's department of corrections, or the federal Bureau of Prisons, the commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice and all rights and duties created by that commitment are automatically suspended pending final disposition of the criminal charge. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Juvenile Justice shall include in its report to the Governor and General Assembly staff-to-youth ratios in accordance with the federal Prison Rape Elimination Act definitions. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUVENILE JUSTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0159
2019-07-26HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-041-000
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-11HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2041512gAmended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-750Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-2.5-61Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback