IL HB3700 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall provide coverage for prescription inhalants for those 18 years old or younger suffering from asthma or other life-threatening bronchial ailments. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CD-COVERAGE FOR INHALANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-01-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 020-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |