IL HB3692 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that certain supplier diversity goal reporting requirements shall not apply to alternative retail electric suppliers. Provides that alternative retail electric suppliers may satisfy certain reporting requirements by reporting the number of Illinois-based female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises engaged by the supplier. Provides that an alternative retail electric supplier may submit the required report on a confidential basis. Effective immediately or on the date certain provisions of Public Act 99-906 take effect, whichever is later.
Title
UTILITY-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | To Resources and Management Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 5-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3692&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3692.htm |