IL HB3691 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Creates the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program. Provides for the implementation of and requirements for the Program. Provides for the State Treasurer's duties under the Program. Provides that the State Treasurer may adopt any rules that may be necessary to implement the Program. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-SAVINGS PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-046-000
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 012-002-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-28HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.8New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback