IL HB3686 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall not assess a fee on an alternative retail electric supplier or an alternative gas supplier that exceeds $0.50 per customer per year. Provides that the number of customers of an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier shall be determined by the most recent annual report to the Commission. Effective immediately or on the date specified provisions amended by Public Act 99-906 take effect, whichever is later.
Title
PUBLIC UTILITY ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | To Resources and Management Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 2-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3686&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3686.htm |