IL HB3684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, any individual who has completed specified training requirements shall be considered a certified food service sanitation manager or a certified food service sanitation manager instructor. Removes provisions providing that a food service sanitation manager certificate or food service sanitation manager instructor certificate shall be provided by the Department of Public Health and removes corresponding provisions concerning the Department charging specified fees for the certificates. Removes provisions concerning recertification and certificate reciprocity. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, a food service sanitation manager certificate or food service sanitation manager instructor certificate issued by an exam provider shall be valid for 5 years and nontransferable (currently, the certificates are provided by the Department, valid for 5 years, nontransferable, and may be revoked by the Department). Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
FOOD SERVICE SANITATION CERT
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0194 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 625 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |