IL HB3684 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Foster Children's Bill of Rights Act. Provides that it is the policy of this State that every child and adult in the care of the Department of Children and Family Services who is placed in foster care shall have certain rights, including the right to: (i) live in a safe, healthy, and comfortable home where he or she is treated with respect; (ii) be free from physical, sexual, emotional, or other abuse, or corporal punishment; (iii) receive adequate and healthy food, adequate clothing, and, for youth in group homes, an allowance; (iv) receive medical, dental, vision, and mental health services; (v) be free of the administration of medication or chemical substances, unless authorized by a physician; (vi) contact family members, unless prohibited by court order, and social workers, attorneys, foster youth advocates, and other specified persons; (vii) contact the Advocacy Office for Children and Families established under the Children and Family Services Act or the Department of Children and Family Services' Office of the Inspector General regarding violations of rights, speak to representatives of these offices confidentially, and be free from threats or punishment for making complaints; (viii) attend court hearings and speak to the judge; (ix) review his or her own case plan and plan for permanent placement, and receive information about his or her out-of-home placement and case plan, including being told of changes to the case plan; and (x) receive a copy of the Act and have it fully explained to him or her when he or she is placed in the care of the Department of Children and Family Services. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be interpreted to require a foster care provider to take any action that would impair the health and safety of children in out-of-home placement.
Title
FOSTER CHILDREN-BILL OF RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0344 |
2015-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |