IL HB3678 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for individual taxpayers who participate in an apprenticeship program during the taxable year. Provides that the credit is equal to the unreimbursed expenses incurred by the taxpayer to purchase equipment that is necessary for participation in the apprenticeship program, not to exceed $1,000 per taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-APPRENTICESHIP CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Benton [D] | Rep. Travis Weaver [R] | Rep. Gregg Johnson [D] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] |
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] | Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3678&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3678.htm |