IL HB3672 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act, the Local Mass Transit District Act, and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that no later than 180 days following the effective date of the amendatory Act, any fixed route public transportation services provided by, or under grant or purchase of service contracts of, the Chicago Transit Board, a local Mass Transit District, the Suburban Bus Board, or the Commuter Rail Board must be provided without charge for 30 days to an individual who resides in the area of the Boards or Districts who was issued an emergency or plenary order of protection. Provides that the Boards and Districts must prescribe conditions of the program, including the information an individual must provide to determine eligibility.
Title
TRANSIT-ORDERS OF PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3605 | 51.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3610 | 8.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 3A.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 3B.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3672&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3672.htm |