IL HB3669 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 and the Riverboat Gambling Act to authorize electronic gaming at race tracks (and makes conforming changes in the Criminal Code of 2012). Further amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Indefinitely extends the authorization for advance deposit wagering. Contains provisions concerning testing of horses at county fairs and standardbred horses. Makes changes concerning the Illinois Racing Board, the award of race dates under the Act, the Illinois Thoroughbred Breeders Fund, and the Illinois Racing Quarter Horse Breeders Fund. Further amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Requires that certain fees related to electronic gaming shall be deposited into the Gaming Facilities Fee Revenue Fund. Makes changes in provisions concerning the admission tax and privilege tax. Makes other changes. Amends the State Finance Act create the Gaming Facilities Fee Revenue Fund as a special fund within the State treasury. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HORSE RACING-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2301011Amended CodeCitation Text
2301011.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2301012Amended CodeCitation Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text
2301014Amended CodeCitation Text
2301015Amended CodeCitation Text
2301017.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2301018Amended CodeCitation Text
2301018.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2301019Amended CodeCitation Text
2301020Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text
230104Amended CodeCitation Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text
230105.1Amended CodeCitation Text
230107.7New CodeSee Bill Text
230107.8New CodeSee Bill Text
230108Amended CodeCitation Text
230109Amended CodeCitation Text
23051.2Amended CodeCitation Text
230515Amended CodeCitation Text
230518Amended CodeCitation Text
230519Amended CodeCitation Text
230520Amended CodeCitation Text
230521Amended CodeCitation Text
230524Amended CodeCitation Text
230525Amended CodeCitation Text
230526Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.8Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.9Amended CodeCitation Text
230527Amended CodeCitation Text
23053.11Amended CodeCitation Text
23053.12Amended CodeCitation Text
23053.31New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.32New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.33New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.35New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.36New CodeSee Bill Text
230530Amended CodeCitation Text
230530.5Amended CodeCitation Text
230531Amended CodeCitation Text
230532.1Amended CodeCitation Text
230534.3New CodeSee Bill Text
230536Amended CodeCitation Text
230540Amended CodeCitation Text
230554Repealed CodeCitation Text
230554.75Amended CodeCitation Text
230556New CodeSee Bill Text
23056Amended CodeCitation Text
23059Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.490Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-102New CodeSee Bill Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-5Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback