IL HB3662 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that, with respect to firefighters and emergency medical technicians, a contagious staph infection, including Methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MRSA), is rebuttably presumed to arise out of and in the course of employment. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKER COMP MRSA PRESUMPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0493 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-001-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |