IL HB3658 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that persons licensed to possess a concealed firearm under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act and current or retired police officers authorized by law to possess a concealed firearm shall be exempt from provisions of the Code prohibiting possession of those firearms.
Title
WILDLIFE-CONCEALED CARRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3658&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3658.htm |