IL HB3657 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that no public utility shall begin the construction of any nuclear power plant extension, alteration, or addition unless and until it has obtained from the Illinois Commerce Commission a certificate that public convenience and necessity require such construction. Removes a provision that prohibits the issuance of a certificate of public convenience and necessity by the Commission regarding the construction of any new power plant within this State until the Director of the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency finds that the United States Government has identified and approved a demonstrable technology or means for the disposal of high level nuclear waste, or until such construction has been specifically approved by a statute enacted by the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NUCLEAR POWER PLANT EXTENSIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22058-406Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback