IL HB3656 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides further requirements for vehicles approaching a stationary authorized emergency vehicle that is displaying flashing emergency lighting. Creates and tasks the Move Over Early Warning Task Force with studying: (1) the issue of violations of the provisions of the Code prescribing how to safely enter a highway construction zone, approach a disabled vehicle, and approach an authorized emergency vehicle; and (2) new technologies and early warning systems in cellular phones and vehicles that alert the public to the presence of first responders and road safety hazards. Prescribes membership for the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall meet and present its report and recommendations, including legislative recommendations, if any, to the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2023. Repeals the provisions governing the Task Force on January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-LAW ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2021
2021-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-03-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305001-15.15Amended CodeCitation Text
3050010-20Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-907Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback