IL HB3653 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Act. Provides that the administration of the Act is transferred to the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Response Officers of certain Departments shall collectively form the Interagency HIV/AIDS Prevention Team (IIHAPT). Provides that the IIHAPT must establish its own guidelines for operation. Sets for the responsibilities of the IIHAPT. Provides that the Department must partner with the Administrative Support Agency (ASA) to coordinate the response to HIV/AIDS in the African American Community. Sets forth duties of the ASA. Provides that the HIV/AIDS Response Review Panel must work with the ASA and IIHAPT to create and implement a comprehensive State-wide plan to reduce the HIV infection rate within the African American Community. Provides that the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Fund shall become a line item in the State's annual budget. Provides that the amount of $10,000,000 shall be deposited into the Fund at the beginning of each fiscal year and that this amount shall be reduced each year equal to the amount that is raised from other sources each year of the Fund's existence. Sets forth expenditures for the Fund. Makes other changes.
Title
HIV/AIDS PREVENTION TEAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-001 | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-03-24 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-24 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-23 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed | |
2009-03-17 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-17 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-17 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-001 | |
2009-03-11 | Remains in State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Motion Do Pass - Lost State Government Administration Committee; 008-003-001 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3653&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3653.htm |