IL HB3650 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Agricultural Experiences Act. Provides that licenses are not required for anyone trying to provide an "agricultural experience" which is defined as any agriculture-related activity, as a secondary use in conjunction with agricultural production, on a farm which activity is open to the public with the intended purpose of promoting or educating the public about agriculture, agricultural practices, agricultural activities, or agricultural products.
Title
AGRICULTURAL EXPERIENCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0492 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |