IL HB3649 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Requires each State agency to report to the State Comptroller the aggregate dollar amount of all current liabilities held at the time of the report and an estimate of any interest penalties that have accrued under the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that the report shall be made in a time and form prescribed by the State Comptroller. Removes related language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST FINANCE-CURRENT LIABILITIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-10-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-10-12HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-06HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney
2017-09-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-07-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-016-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-001
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-040-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-001-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-16HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-07HouseRe-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301059.08Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback