IL HB3649 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall investigate every allegation of abuse or neglect of a patient received by the Department. Provides that no administrator, agent, or employee of a hospital or a member of its medical staff may abuse or neglect a patient in the hospital, and provides that any hospital administrator, agent, employee, or medical staff member who has reasonable cause to believe that any patient with whom he or she has direct contact has been subjected to abuse or neglect in the hospital shall promptly report or cause a report to be made to a designated hospital administrator responsible for providing such reports to the Department of Public Health. Sets forth other provisions concerning protection of hospital patients from abuse and neglect. Provides that if no health care surrogate is available for a patient who lacks decision-making capacity, then the hospital may contact the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission to determine the need for a temporary guardian of the person.
Title
IDPH-HOSPITALS-ABUSE-NEGLECT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0692 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-21 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein | |
2009-05-14 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg |