IL HB3648 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that none of the benefits provided for in the Article shall be paid to any person who (i) first becomes a member on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and (ii) is convicted of any felony. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-GARS-FELONY FORFEITURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4052-156Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback