IL HB3648 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that City of Chicago's Commission on Human Relations shall: (1) require all administrative hearing officers to be an attorney licensed to practice law in this State; (2) follow all applicable federal, State, and local laws and regulations, including all applicable legal precedent in court decisions; and (3) establish an administrative system that ensures that administrative hearing officers are impartial when hearing cases that come before the commission. Limits home rule powers.
Title
COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0669 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-002-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-31 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-001 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |