IL HB3648 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that City of Chicago's Commission on Human Relations shall: (1) require all administrative hearing officers to be an attorney licensed to practice law in this State; (2) follow all applicable federal, State, and local laws and regulations, including all applicable legal precedent in court decisions; and (3) establish an administrative system that ensures that administrative hearing officers are impartial when hearing cases that come before the commission. Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0669
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-002-000
2018-05-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-01-22SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-06-08SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-001
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-5-11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3648&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0669.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3648sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3648_04282017_059000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3648_05292018_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3648sam001_05312018_037000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback