IL HB3647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Job Opportunities for Qualified Applicants Act. Provides that inquiries into a job applicant's criminal history may not inquire into events occurring more than 5 years before the date of the inquiry.
Title
EMPLOY CRIM HISTORY 5 YR LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Tabled |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 75 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3647&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3647.htm |