IL HB3646 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that a referendum for the voters of each township that is coterminous, or substantially coterminous, with a municipality shall be held on the November 5, 2020 general election to dissolve the township and transfer all the rights, powers, duties, assets, property, liabilities, obligations, and responsibilities to the coterminous municipality. Provides that this is in addition to any other method provided by law to dissolve a township. Repeals these provisions on July 1, 2023. Provides that a township may hire employees to administer the roads of a discontinued road district. Amends the Property Tax Code and Illinois Public Aid Code making conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides for similar provisions for abolishing a road district that is coterminous, or substantially coterminous, with a township at the November 5, 2020 general election. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP & ROAD DIST-CONSOLIDATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 3-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |