IL HB3646 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides the Department of State Police shall establish, operate, and maintain a sexual assault evidence kit tracking system that uses electronic technology to allow continuous access to approved users within the system. Provides that law enforcement agencies, health care providers, crime laboratories, and prosecuting attorneys in this State shall participate in the system on a schedule and manner required by the Department. Provides that statewide participation in the sexual assault tracking system shall be fully implemented by January 1, 2019. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019 and each year thereafter, the Department shall publish a quarterly report on its website, indicating a breakdown of the number of sexual assault case submissions from every law enforcement agency including: the number of kits in the system, and of those, the number on which analysis has been completed and the number on which analysis has not been completed; the number of kits entered into the system during the prior 6 months, and of those kits the number on which analysis has been completed; the average and median length of time for kits to be sent to analysis after being entered into the system and for analysis to be completed; and the number of kits that has been entered into the system for more than 1 year for which analysis has not yet been completed. Makes other changes.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDNC TRACKING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 202 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 202 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3646&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3646.htm |