IL HB3644 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Creates the Trauma, Resiliency, and Recovery Task Force as an independent Task Force under the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority. Provides for the duties of the Task Force. Provides for the appointment of membership to the Task Force, including co-chairpersons. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority may receive an appropriation to enter into personnel contracts to support the work of the Task Force, and that the Authority may also consult, contract, work in conjunction with, and obtain any information from any individual, agency, association, or research institution deemed appropriate by the Authority. Requires the Task Force to submit a written report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019. Repeals the Section on January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM JUSTICE INFO-TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-25HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20393020New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback